+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned PA 57'20 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 03/10/2020 02:12 PM
- Approved by the Governor 03/10/2020 01:40 PM
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 02/27/2020 03:04 PM
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 79 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary and public safety
On December 11, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 377 Yeas 96 Nays 12 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
- Read a third time
- Placed on immediate passage
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On December 3, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On June 12, 2019 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 06/12/2019
On June 11, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Steven Johnson