+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned PA 43'14 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 3/25/2014 @ 4:08 PM
- Approved by the Governor 3/25/2014 @ 2:34 PM
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 3/19/2014 @ 10:54 AM
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Roll Call # 103 Yeas 106 Nays 3
- Senate substitute S-1 concurred in
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Returned from Senate with substitute S-1 with immediate effect and full title
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 91 yeas 35 nays 0 excused 3 not voting 0
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
On December 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on regulatory reform
On November 14, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 433 Yeas 106 Nays 4
- Read a third time
On November 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On October 29, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 05/09/2013
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Regulatory Reform
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Peter MacGregor
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor