+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On December 31, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned PA 611'18
- Filed with Secretary of State 12/28/2018 @ 5:34 PM
- Approved by the Governor 12/28/2018 @ 4:05 PM 12/31/18 ADDENDA
On December 28, 2018 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 12/26/2018 @ 7:34 PM
On December 20, 2018 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with full title
On December 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Immediate effect defeated
- Passed roll call # 1001 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
- Placed on immediate passage
- Rules suspended
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On December 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole
On November 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on elections and government reform
On November 8, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on immediate passage
- Read a second time
- Substitute H-3 adopted
- Placed on third reading
- Read a third time
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 627 Yeas 108 Nays 0
- Title amended
- Transmitted
On May 17, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-3
On June 7, 2017 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 06/06/2017
On June 6, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Elections and Ethics
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Jim Lilly