+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (35)
On January 8, 2020 in the House:
- Re-referred to Committee on Government Operations
On December 19, 2019 in the House:
- Vetoed by the Governor 12/18/2019
On December 10, 2019 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 12/09/2019 10:19 AM
On December 3, 2019 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Senate amendment(s) concurred in Roll Call # 330 Yeas 61 Nays 44 Excused 0 Not Voting 4
On November 20, 2019 in the House:
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Returned from Senate with amendment(s) with full title
On November 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed roll call # 317 yeas 21 nays 14 excused 2 not voting 1
- Placed on immediate passage
- Rules suspended
- Placed on order of third reading with amendment(s)
- Amendment(s) concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with amendment(s)
On November 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably with amendment(s)
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole with amendment(s)
On November 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on government operations
On November 5, 2019 in the House:
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
- Referred to second reading
- Read a second time
- Amended
- Postponed temporarily
- Amended
- Placed on third reading
- Placed on immediate passage
- Read a third time
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 312 Yeas 57 Nays 49 Excused 0 Not Voting 4
- Title amended
- Transmitted
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 06/05/2019
On June 4, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Government Operations
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Michele Hoitenga