+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on transportation and infrastructure
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 82 Yeas 106 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
- Read a third time
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On December 10, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On May 29, 2019 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 05/29/2019
On May 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Military, Veterans and Homeland Security
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Hank Vaupel