+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on government operations
On June 9, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 307 Yeas 71 Nays 38 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
- Read a third time
On June 8, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute (H-1) adopted
- Read a second time
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-1)
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 04/21/2021
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Elections and Ethics
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative John Roth
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor