+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 19, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned PA 78'22 with immediate effect
- Approved by the Governor 05/19/2022 10:42 AM
- Filed with Secretary of State 05/19/2022 11:30 AM
On May 11, 2022 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 05/11/2022 09:15 AM
On May 5, 2022 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect
On May 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 202 yeas 33 nays 1 excused 4 not voting 0
On April 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On April 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On December 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary and public safety
On December 8, 2021 in the House:
- Read a third time
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 591 Yeas 96 Nays 8 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
- Title amended
On December 7, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute (H-2) adopted
- Read a second time
On November 9, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-2)
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 04/21/2021
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules and Competitiveness
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Bradley Slagh