+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned PA 42'18 with immediate effect
- Approved by the Governor 2/28/2018 @ 8:42 AM
- Filed with Secretary of State 2/28/2018 @ 4:32 PM
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 2/20/2018 @ 9:36 AM
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Roll Call # 58 Yeas 105 Nays 3
- Senate substitute S-2 concurred in
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Returned from Senate with substitute S-2 with immediate effect and full title
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 58 yeas 36 nays 0 excused 2 not voting 0
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-2
- Substitute s-2 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-2
On November 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
On September 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on education
On September 13, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 269 Yeas 104 Nays 3
- Read a third time
On September 12, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-1 adopted
- Read a second time
On September 7, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On May 31, 2017 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 05/30/2017
On May 30, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education Reform
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Rob VerHeulen