+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (34)
On July 3, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned PA 86'13 with immediate effect
- Approved by the Governor 6/27/2013 @ 3:24 PM
- Presented to the Governor 6/26/2013 @ 10:54 AM
- Filed with Secretary of State 6/28/2013 @ 3:45 PM
On June 20, 2013 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Rep. Phil Potvin removed as sponsor
- Title amendment agreed to
- Roll Call # 259 Yeas 102 Nays 7
- Senate substitute S-2 concurred in
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-2
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Substitute s-2 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-2
- Rules suspended
- Placed on immediate passage
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 274 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
- Inserted full title
On June 13, 2013 in the House:
- Returned from Senate with substitute S-2 with immediate effect and title amendment
- Laid over one day under the rules
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on appropriations
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Read a second time
- Substitute H-1 adopted
- Placed on immediate passage
- Placed on third reading
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 196 Yeas 102 Nays 7
- Transmitted
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 05/03/2013
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Phil Potvin
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor