+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned PA 99'16 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 5/3/2016 @ 11:52 AM
- Approved by the Governor 5/3/2016 @ 10:18 AM
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 4/25/2016 @ 1:19 PM
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 176 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole
On September 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on insurance
On September 24, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 315 Yeas 104 Nays 1
- Read a third time
On September 22, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On September 10, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 06/03/2015
On June 2, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Insurance
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Henry Vaupel
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor