+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On December 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on commerce
On December 7, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 589 Yeas 57 Nays 50
- Read a third time
On December 6, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On November 29, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 05/27/2015
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Trade
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Gary Glenn