+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On July 12, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned PA 77'17 with immediate effect
- Approved by the Governor 7/11/2017 @ 12:03 PM
- Presented to the Governor 6/27/2017 @ 12:06 PM
- Filed with Secretary of State 7/11/2017 @ 1:18 PM
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
- Placed on order of third reading
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Placed on immediate passage
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 276 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
- Inserted full title
On June 15, 2017 in the House:
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
- Full title agreed to
- Bill ordered enrolled
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary
On June 8, 2017 in the House:
- Read a third time
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 192 Yeas 107 Nays 0
- Transmitted
On June 7, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On June 6, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 05/23/2017
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Law and Justice
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Pam Faris
+ − Sponsors (55)
Type:
Primary Sponsor