+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On July 12, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned PA 76'17 with immediate effect
- Approved by the Governor 7/11/2017 @ 12:01 PM
- Presented to the Governor 6/27/2017 @ 12:04 PM
- Filed with Secretary of State 7/11/2017 @ 1:16 PM
On June 20, 2017 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Roll Call # 223 Yeas 107 Nays 0
- Senate substitute S-1 concurred in
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Placed on immediate passage
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 275 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
- Inserted full title
On June 15, 2017 in the House:
- Returned from Senate with substitute S-1 with immediate effect and full title
- Laid over one day under the rules
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary
On June 8, 2017 in the House:
- Read a third time
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 191 Yeas 107 Nays 0
- Transmitted
On June 7, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-1 adopted
- Read a second time
On June 6, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 05/23/2017
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Law and Justice
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Stephanie Chang
+ − Sponsors (57)
Type:
Primary Sponsor