+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On December 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on elections and government reform
On December 12, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 822 Yeas 100 Nays 9
- Read a third time
- Placed on immediate passage
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 05/23/2017
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Elections and Ethics
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Jeremy Moss
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor