+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned PA 102'18 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 4/5/2018 @ 2:50 PM
- Approved by the Governor 4/2/2018 @ 11:54 AM
- Presented to the Governor 3/26/2018 @ 12:50 PM
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 178 yeas 34 nays 0 excused 3 not voting 0
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 124 Yeas 109 Nays 0
- Read a third time
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 05/23/2017
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Law and Justice
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Tommy Brann
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor