+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On December 28, 2016 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 12/21/2016 @ 3:58 PM
On December 15, 2016 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Roll Call # 719 Yeas 101 Nays 7
- Senate substitute S-1 concurred in
On December 14, 2016 in the House:
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Returned from Senate with substitute S-1 with immediate effect and full title
On December 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 778 yeas 29 nays 8 excused 1 not voting 0
On December 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
On May 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 127 Yeas 100 Nays 7
- Read a third time
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-1 adopted
- Read a second time
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Recommendation concurred in
- Reported with recommendation for referral to Committee on Oversight and Ethics
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 05/21/2015
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Peter Lucido
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor