+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 10, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned PA 138'18 with immediate effect
- Approved by the Governor 5/9/2018 @ 3:36 PM
- Filed with Secretary of State 5/10/2018 @ 10:50 AM
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 4/26/2018 @ 3:52 PM
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Roll Call # 237 Yeas 106 Nays 0
- Senate substitute S-1 concurred in
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Returned from Senate with substitute S-1 with immediate effect and title amendment
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 216 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on transportation
On June 20, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 242 Yeas 107 Nays 0
- Read a third time
- Placed on immediate passage
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On June 14, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 05/18/2017
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Daire Rendon
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor