+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On August 15, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned PA 202'18 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 6/20/2018 @ 1:34 PM
- Approved by the Governor 6/19/2018 @ 8:20 PM
On June 12, 2018 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 6/7/2018 @ 2:11 PM
On June 5, 2018 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
On June 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 389 yeas 36 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
On May 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On May 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on education
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 104 Yeas 108 Nays 0
- Read a third time
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 05/17/2017
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education Reform
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Aaron Miller
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor