+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on government operations
On June 10, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 232 Yeas 64 Nays 45
- Read a third time
On June 9, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-1 adopted
- Read a second time
On June 4, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 05/15/2015
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Roads and Economic Development
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Phil Potvin