+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On November 29, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned PA 324'16 with immediate effect
- Approved by the Governor 11/22/2016 @ 12:14 PM
- Presented to the Governor 11/15/2016 @ 10:32 AM
- Filed with Secretary of State 11/22/2016 @ 2:26 PM
On November 9, 2016 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Senate amendment(s) concurred in Roll Call # 503 Yeas 80 Nays 25
- Rule suspended
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Returned from Senate with amendment(s) with immediate effect and full title
On October 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with amendment(s)
- Amendment(s) concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with amendment(s)
- Rules suspended
- Placed on immediate passage
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 573 yeas 36 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
- Inserted full title
On October 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On May 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Read a third time
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 275 Yeas 87 Nays 22
- Transmitted
On May 12, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-1 adopted
- Read a second time
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 05/14/2015
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Kurt Heise