+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (34)
On July 16, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned PA 175'14 with immediate effect
- Presented to the Governor 6/13/2014 @ 2:38 PM
- Filed with Secretary of State 6/17/2014 @ 4:12 PM
- Approved by the Governor 6/17/2014 @ 12:16 PM
On June 10, 2014 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Roll Call # 372 Yeas 109 Nays 1
- Senate substitute S-1 concurred in
On June 4, 2014 in the House:
- Laid over one day under the rules
On June 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 350 yeas 36 nays 1 excused 1 not voting 0
- Placed on immediate passage
- Rules suspended
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
On June 4, 2014 in the House:
- Returned from Senate with substitute S-1 with immediate effect and full title
On May 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on regulatory reform
On May 8, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Title amended
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 218 Yeas 108 Nays 1
- Read a third time
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-4 adopted
- Read a second time
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-4
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 04/18/2013
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Regulatory Reform
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Frank Foster
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor