+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On September 22, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned PA 162'20 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 09/17/2020 11:54 AM
- Approved by the Governor 09/17/2020 10:41 AM
On September 9, 2020 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 09/09/2020 01:25 PM
On September 3, 2020 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
On September 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 274 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
On September 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On June 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on transportation and infrastructure
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 41 Yeas 104 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 5
- Read a third time
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On December 3, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 05/14/2019
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Ben Frederick
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor