+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On December 31, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned PA 248'15 with immediate effect 2015 ADDENDA
- Filed with Secretary of State 12/22/2015 @ 3:52 PM 2015 ADDENDA
- Approved by the Governor 12/22/2015 @ 10:30 AM 2015 ADDENDA
- Presented to the Governor 12/21/2015 @ 11:24 AM 2015 ADDENDA
On December 16, 2015 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect
On December 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 634 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On December 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On September 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on local government
On September 16, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 298 Yeas 103 Nays 0
- Read a third time
On September 9, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-1 adopted
- Read a second time
On June 17, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 05/08/2015
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Eric Leutheuser
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor