+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On August 16, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned PA 88'17 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 7/12/2017 @ 1:12 PM
- Approved by the Governor 7/12/2017 @ 10:57 AM
On July 12, 2017 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 6/29/2017 @ 2:48 PM
- Bill ordered enrolled 06/22/2017
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 306 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on regulatory reform
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 149 Yeas 108 Nays 0
- Read a third time
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Amended
- Read a second time
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 05/02/2017
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Regulatory Reform
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Tom Barrett
+ − Sponsors (66)
Type:
Primary Sponsor