+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On October 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Reported favorably without amendment
On June 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on regulatory reform
On June 17, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 338 Yeas 100 Nays 10 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
- Read a third time
On June 15, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute (H-1) adopted
- Read a second time
On June 8, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-1)
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 03/23/2021
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Regulatory Reform
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Annette Glenn
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor