+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On June 2, 2016 in the House:
- Re-referred to Committee on Criminal Justice
On December 10, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-1 adopted
- Read a second time
On October 27, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 05/06/2015
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Criminal Justice
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Derek Miller
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor