+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (29)
On October 24, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned PA 94 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 10/24/2019 09:02 AM
- Approved by the Governor 10/23/2019 03:54 PM
On October 16, 2019 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 10/14/2019 09:41 AM
On October 10, 2019 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Roll call Roll Call # 256 Yeas 109 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
- Senate substitute (S-1) concurred in
On October 8, 2019 in the House:
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Returned from Senate with substitute (S-1) with immediate effect
On October 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 242 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
On October 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute (s-1)
- Substitute (s-1) concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute (s-1)
On September 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably with substitute
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute (s-1)
On June 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on families, seniors and veterans
On June 6, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 108 Yeas 109 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
- Read a third time
On June 4, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 05/02/2019
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Families, Children, and Seniors
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Kathy Crawford
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor