+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned PA 72'18 with immediate effect
- Approved by the Governor 3/19/2018 @ 11:39 AM
- Filed with Secretary of State 3/19/2018 @ 1:14 PM
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 3/8/2018 @ 2:14 PM
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Roll Call # 127 Yeas 107 Nays 1
- Senate substitute S-2 concurred in
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Returned from Senate with substitute S-2 with immediate effect and full title
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 121 yeas 36 nays 0 excused 2 not voting 0
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-2
- Substitute s-2 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-2
On November 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on commerce
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 123 Yeas 106 Nays 1
- Read a third time
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-4 adopted
- Read a second time
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-4
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 04/27/2017
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Workforce and Talent Development
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Jim Ellison
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor