+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (34)
On September 25, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned PA 115'13 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 9/24/2013 @ 2:46 PM
- Approved by the Governor 9/24/2013 @ 1:48 PM
On September 17, 2013 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 9/17/2013 @ 9:40 AM
On September 10, 2013 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Roll Call # 270 Yeas 107 Nays 1
- Senate substitute S-1 concurred in
On August 28, 2013 in the House:
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Returned from Senate with substitute S-1 with immediate effect and full title
On August 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 335 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
On June 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Postponed for the day
- Vote reconsidered
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 327 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On June 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
On June 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on finance
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 148 Yeas 108 Nays 0
- Read a third time
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Read a second time
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-1 adopted
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 04/12/2013
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Tax Policy
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Tim Kelly
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor