+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on elections and government reform
- Placed on order of general orders
- Discharge committee approved
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on government operations
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 129 Yeas 105 Nays 3
- Read a third time
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Read a second time
- Substitute H-8 not adopted
- Substitute H-9 adopted
- Placed on third reading
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-9
On December 10, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendation concurred in
- Reported with recommendation for referral to Committee on Natural Resources with substitute H-8
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 05/06/2015
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Oversight and Ethics
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Kurt Heise
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor