+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on government operations
On June 2, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Title amended
- Passed Roll Call # 211 Yeas 69 Nays 39
- Read a third time
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-2 adopted and amended
- Read a second time
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-2
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 04/29/2015
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Oversight and Ethics
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Ed McBroom
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor