+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On December 31, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned PA 589'18
- Filed with Secretary of State 12/28/2018 @ 4:30 PM
- Approved by the Governor 12/28/2018 @ 1:33 PM 12/31/18 ADDENDA
On December 28, 2018 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 12/26/2018 @ 5:24 PM
On December 21, 2018 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Roll Call # 986 Yeas 107 Nays 0
- Senate substitute S-2 concurred in
On December 20, 2018 in the House:
- Returned from Senate with substitute S-2 with full title
On December 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Immediate effect defeated
- Passed roll call # 1008 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On December 20, 2018 in the House:
- Laid over one day under the rules
On December 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-2
- Substitute s-2 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-2
On May 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on finance
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Title amended
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 214 Yeas 109 Nays 0
- Read a third time
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-2 adopted
- Read a second time
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-2
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 04/25/2017
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Tax Policy
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Mary Whiteford
+ − Sponsors (70)
Type:
Primary Sponsor