+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (31)
On July 14, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned PA 55'21 with immediate effect
- Approved by the Governor 07/13/2021 10:12 AM
- Filed with Secretary of State 07/13/2021 04:34 PM
On June 30, 2021 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 06/30/2021 02:06 PM
On June 24, 2021 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Senate amendment(s) concurred in by 3/4 vote Roll Call # 391 Yeas 102 Nays 6 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
- Rule suspended
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Returned from Senate with amendment(s) with immediate effect and full title
On June 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed by 3/4 vote; given immediate effect roll call # 309 yeas 35 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
- Amendment(s) adopted
On June 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On June 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on regulatory reform
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed by 3/4 vote; given immediate effect Roll Call # 267 Yeas 102 Nays 6 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
- Read a third time
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute (H-1) adopted
- Read a second time
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-1)
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 03/16/2021
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Regulatory Reform
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Jim Lilly