+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On December 31, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned PA 525'18 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 12/28/2018 @ 2:00 PM
- Approved by the Governor 12/27/2018 @ 4:23 PM 12/31/18 ADDENDA
On December 28, 2018 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 12/26/2018 @ 4:54 PM
On December 20, 2018 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Roll Call # 948 Yeas 108 Nays 0
- Senate substitute S-1 concurred in
- Rule suspended
- Returned from Senate with substitute S-1 with immediate effect
- Laid over one day under the rules
On December 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 895 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
- Placed on immediate passage
- Rules suspended
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
On May 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on families, seniors and human services
On June 20, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 232 Yeas 107 Nays 0
- Read a third time
On June 14, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-1 adopted
- Read a second time
On June 8, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 04/25/2017
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Families, Children, and Seniors
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Diana Farrington
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor