+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On December 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-2
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-2
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on families, seniors and human services
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Title amended
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 24 Yeas 109 Nays 1
- Read a third time
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Read a second time
- Substitute H-5 adopted
- Substitute H-4 not adopted
- Placed on third reading
On December 4, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-4
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 03/21/2013
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Families, Children, and Seniors
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Klint Kesto
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor