+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (29)
On November 5, 2020 in the House:
- Re-referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On October 28, 2020 in the House:
- Vetoed by the Governor 10/28/2020
On October 14, 2020 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 10/16/2020 02:02 PM
On October 13, 2020 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Roll call Roll Call # 469 Yeas 103 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 6
- Senate substitute (S-1) concurred in
On October 1, 2020 in the House:
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Returned from Senate with substitute (S-1) with immediate effect
On October 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 386 yeas 36 nays 1 excused 1 not voting 0
On September 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute (s-1) as amended
- Substitute (s-1) as amended concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute (s-1) and amendment(s)
On September 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably with substitute (s-1)
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute (s-1)
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on transportation and infrastructure
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 125 Yeas 105 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 4
- Read a third time
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute (H-1) adopted
- Read a second time
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-1)
On December 10, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means, with substitute (H-1)
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 04/23/2019
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Gary Eisen
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor