+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned PA 93'16 with immediate effect
- Approved by the Governor 5/3/2016 @ 8:20 AM
- Filed with Secretary of State 5/3/2016 @ 11:40 AM
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 4/25/2016 @ 1:07 PM
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Roll Call # 158 Yeas 107 Nays 1
- Senate substitute S-3 concurred in
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Returned from Senate with substitute S-3 with immediate effect and full title
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 167 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-3
- Substitute s-3 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-3
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably with substitute s-2
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-2
- Committee recommended immediate effect
On October 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary
On October 15, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 357 Yeas 104 Nays 1
- Read a third time
On October 14, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-1 adopted and amended
- Read a second time
On June 9, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 04/22/2015
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Criminal Justice
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Harvey Santana
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor