+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (38)
On October 28, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned PA 234'20 with immediate effect
- Approved by the Governor 10/22/2020 11:30 AM
- Filed with Secretary of State 10/22/2020 12:16 PM
On October 14, 2020 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 10/16/2020 01:48 PM
On October 13, 2020 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Roll call Roll Call # 465 Yeas 97 Nays 6 Excused 0 Not Voting 6
- Senate substitute (S-7) concurred in
On September 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended
- Substitute (s-7) concurred in
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute (s-7)
On September 30, 2020 in the House:
- Laid over one day under the rules
On September 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on immediate passage
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 361 yeas 32 nays 6 excused 0 not voting 0
- Inserted full title
On September 30, 2020 in the House:
- Returned from Senate with substitute (S-7) with immediate effect and full title
On September 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute (s-7)
On September 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably with substitute (s-4)
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute (s-4)
On July 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reassigned to committee on insurance and banking
- Placed on order of general orders
- Discharge committee approved
On June 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on health policy and human services
On June 24, 2020 in the House:
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-6)
- Referred to second reading
- Read a second time
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute (H-6) adopted
- Placed on immediate passage
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 301 Yeas 101 Nays 5 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
- Read a third time
- Transmitted
On November 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means, with substitute (H-5)
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 04/16/2019
- Referred to Committee on Health Policy
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Roger Hauck