+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 10, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to messages from Governor
On June 3, 2021 in the House:
- Re-referred to Committee on Oversight
- Vetoed by the Governor 06/03/2021
On June 2, 2021 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 06/02/2021 09:34 AM
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with full title
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Immediate effect defeated
- Inserted full title
- Passed roll call # 234 yeas 21 nays 15 excused 0 not voting 0
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Referred to committee of the whole
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on oversight
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 153 Yeas 98 Nays 11 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
- Read a third time
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute (H-1) adopted
- Read a second time
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-1)
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 03/04/2021
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Oversight
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Steven Johnson