+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On December 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On December 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary
On December 4, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed Roll Call # 621 Yeas 85 Nays 24
- Read a third time
On December 3, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Amended
- Read a second time
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 03/14/2013
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Criminal Justice
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Andrew Kandrevas
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor