+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 15, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned PA 29'21
- Filed with Secretary of State 06/15/2021 02:24 PM
- Approved by the Governor 06/15/2021 01:06 PM
On June 8, 2021 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 06/08/2021 09:16 AM
On June 3, 2021 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with full title
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed roll call # 251 yeas 36 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Referred to committee of the whole
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on regulatory reform
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 169 Yeas 108 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
- Read a third time
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 03/04/2021
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Regulatory Reform
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Sarah Lightner
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor