+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (42)
On July 13, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned PA 273'16 with immediate effect
- Approved by the Governor 6/29/2016 @ 4:45 PM
- Presented to the Governor 6/22/2016 @ 10:46 AM
- Filed with Secretary of State 7/1/2016 @ 9:37 AM
On June 9, 2016 in the House:
- Retransmitted
- Amended
- Senate substitute S-1 concurred in as substituted H-4
- Roll Call # 421 Yeas 88 Nays 20
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned from house with substitute h-4 to senate substitute s-1
- House substitute h-4 to senate substitute s-1 concurred in
- Roll call # 478 yeas 34 nays 3 excused 0 not voting 0
On June 9, 2016 in the House:
- Re-returned from Senate with concurrence to House substitute H-4 to Senate substitute S-1
- Bill ordered enrolled
On May 12, 2016 in the House:
- Postponed temporarily
- Substitute H-4 adopted
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to messages from the Senate
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-4 to Senate substitute S-1
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Re-referred to Committee on Appropriations
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Placed on immediate passage
- Rules suspended
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 238 yeas 35 nays 3 excused 0 not voting 0
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Returned from Senate with substitute S-1 with immediate effect
- Laid over one day under the rules
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on appropriations
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Read a third time
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 101 Yeas 107 Nays 3
- Transmitted
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-1 adopted
- Read a second time
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
- Printed bill filed 04/15/2015
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Edward Canfield
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor