+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On November 2, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned PA 92'21 with immediate effect
- Approved by the Governor 10/29/2021 10:05 AM
- Filed with Secretary of State 10/29/2021 11:48 AM
On October 19, 2021 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 10/19/2021 11:48 AM
On October 13, 2021 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Roll call Roll Call # 465 Yeas 105 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
- Senate substitute (S-3) concurred in
On September 29, 2021 in the House:
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Returned from Senate with substitute (S-3) with immediate effect and full title
On September 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 353 yeas 36 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On September 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute (s-3)
- Substitute (s-3) concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute (s-3)
On September 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably with substitute (s-3)
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute (s-3)
- Committee recommended immediate effect
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on regulatory reform
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 214 Yeas 107 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
- Read a third time
On May 18, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 03/04/2021
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Regulatory Reform
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Kevin Hertel
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor