+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On December 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary and public safety
On December 9, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 598 Yeas 102 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 5
- Read a third time
On December 7, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute (H-3) adopted
- Read a second time
On October 26, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-3)
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-3)
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 03/04/2021
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Regulatory Reform
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Ryan Berman