+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (31)
On October 17, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned PA 124'17 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 10/12/2017 @ 1:00 PM
- Approved by the Governor 10/12/2017 @ 11:37 AM
On October 12, 2017 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 10/11/2017 @ 4:33 PM
On October 11, 2017 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Senate amendment(s) concurred in Roll Call # 299 Yeas 108 Nays 0
On May 30, 2017 in the House:
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Returned from Senate with amendment(s) with immediate effect and full title
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 232 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
- Amendment(s) adopted
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
- Placed on order of third reading
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on natural resources
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- Read a second time
- Substitute H-1 adopted
- Placed on third reading
- Placed on immediate passage
- Read a third time
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 99 Yeas 104 Nays 0
- Transmitted
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 03/28/2017
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Natural Resources
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative John Kivela
+ − Sponsors (102)
Type:
Primary Sponsor