+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (31)
On December 28, 2016 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 12/22/2016 @ 4:04 PM
On December 13, 2016 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Title amendment agreed to
- Roll Call # 625 Yeas 57 Nays 51
- Senate substitute S-4 concurred in
On December 7, 2016 in the House:
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Returned from Senate with substitute S-4 with immediate effect and title amendment
On December 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 691 yeas 28 nays 8 excused 1 not voting 1
- Substitute s-4 adopted
On December 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-2
- Substitute s-2 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-2
On November 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably with substitute s-2
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-2
- Committee recommended immediate effect
On June 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on transportation
On June 1, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 340 Yeas 56 Nays 53
- Substitute H-7 adopted and amended
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Postponed temporarily
- Read a third time
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Read a second time
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-4 adopted
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-4
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 04/15/2015
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Bradford Jacobsen
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor