+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (35)
On December 28, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned PA 255'17 with immediate effect
- Approved by the Governor 12/27/2017 @ 12:22 PM
- Presented to the Governor 12/18/2017 @ 11:20 AM
- Filed with Secretary of State 12/27/2017 @ 2:34 PM
On December 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on immediate passage
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Rules suspended
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 533 yeas 37 nays 1 excused 0 not voting 0
- Inserted full title
On December 13, 2017 in the House:
- Returned from Senate with substitute S-1 with immediate effect and full title
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Rule suspended
- Senate substitute S-1 concurred in
- Roll Call # 507 Yeas 105 Nays 5
- Full title agreed to
- Bill ordered enrolled
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on health policy
On June 13, 2017 in the House:
- Read a third time
- Title amended
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 204 Yeas 102 Nays 5
- Transmitted
On June 7, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-1 adopted
- Read a second time
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 03/23/2017
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health Policy
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Beth Griffin
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor