+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (39)
On June 11, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned PA 22'19 with immediate effect
- Approved by the Governor 06/11/2019 02:24 PM
- Filed with Secretary of State 06/11/2019 03:24 PM
On June 6, 2019 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 06/06/2019 09:26 AM
On June 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 125 yeas 33 nays 4 excused 1 not voting 0
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute (s-1)
- Substitute (s-1) concurred in
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute (s-1)
- Rules suspended
- Placed on immediate passage
On June 4, 2019 in the House:
- Returned from Senate with substitute (S-1) with immediate effect and title amendment
On June 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
On June 4, 2019 in the House:
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Rule suspended
- Senate substitute (S-1) concurred in
- Roll call Roll Call # 107 Yeas 89 Nays 20 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
- Title amendment agreed to
- Bill ordered enrolled
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Roll Call # 84 Yeas 61 Nays 49 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
- Placed on immediate passage
- Read a third time
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Title amended
- Transmitted
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Rule suspended
- Motion to discharge committee approved
- Placed on second reading
- Read a second time
- Substitute (H-1) adopted and amended
- Postponed for the day
- Amendment(s) reconsidered
- Amendment(s) not adopted
- Amended
- Placed on third reading
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 03/20/2019
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Insurance
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Jason Sheppard