+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (29)
On December 31, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned PA 264'20
- Filed with Secretary of State 12/29/2020 01:00 PM
- Approved by the Governor 12/29/2020 09:10 AM
On December 23, 2020 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 12/22/2020 05:19 PM
On December 16, 2020 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Returned from Senate without amendment
On December 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Immediate effect defeated
- Passed roll call # 559 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
- Placed on immediate passage
- Rules suspended
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On September 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on transportation and infrastructure
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 76 Yeas 108 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
- Read a third time
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 03/20/2019
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Robert Wittenberg
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor