+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On August 6, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned PA 143'20 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 07/31/2020 03:34 PM
- Approved by the Governor 07/31/2020 02:41 PM
On July 23, 2020 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 07/23/2020 04:02 PM
On July 21, 2020 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Roll call Roll Call # 306 Yeas 103 Nays 4 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
- Senate substitute (S-1) concurred in
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Returned from Senate with substitute (S-1) with immediate effect and full title
- Rule suspended
On June 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 238 yeas 36 nays 1 excused 1 not voting 0
On June 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute (s-1)
- Substitute (s-1) concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute (s-1)
On October 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably with substitute (s-1)
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute (s-1)
- Committee recommended immediate effect
On October 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on environmental quality
On October 3, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 251 Yeas 104 Nays 4 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
- Read a third time
On October 2, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute (H-2) adopted
- Read a second time
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-2)
On June 11, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means, with substitute (H-2)
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 03/20/2019
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Outdoor Recreation
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Jeff Yaroch